Mertz, Dominik (CPSO#: 95042)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Basel, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Infection Prevention and Control
Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Center
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 43952
Fax: (905) 577-1415
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Mertz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mertz ( CPSO# 95042 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Centre
Infection Prevention and Control
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Switzerland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Dominik Mertz may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of Infectious Diseases, McMaster University, in which Dr.
                        Mertz holds  an  academic  appointment  at  the  rank  of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr.  Mertz  no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.