Mestre, Tiago Alexandre (CPSO#: 94208)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 2014

Expiry Date:  31 Jan 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Feb 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Lisboa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Neurology
Room 2174
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 18986
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tiago A. Mestre Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Mestre ( CPSO# 94208 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Neurology
Room 2174
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Portugal

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 01 Feb 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jul 2010 to 24 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 25 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Aug 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jan 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Aug 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Tiago Alexandre Mestre may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Neurology,  University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Mestre
                        holds an academic appointment  at  the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  seven  years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or when Dr. Mestre  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Mestre's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,  professional  conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr. Mestre's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on February 1, 2014.  In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate  will,  if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on January 31, 2021.