Mielniczuk, Lisa Marie (CPSO#: 72258)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Room H-1295
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7274
Fax: (613) 696-7138
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Mielniczuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mielniczuk ( CPSO# 72258 )

Business Address:
Suite H-1295B
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7274

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA MARIE MIELNICZUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIELNICZUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2003