Miller-Monthrope, Yvette Elouise (CPSO#: 83155)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wellmedica Dermatology Centre
90 Resolution Drive #2
Brampton ON  L6W 0A7
Phone: (416) 883-3877
Fax: (855)320-2591
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yvette Miller-Monthrope Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Miller-Monthrope ( CPSO# 83155 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-7546

Business Address:
Well Medical Dermatology Centre
Unit 2
90 Resolution Drive
Brampton ON  L6W 0A7
Phone Number: (416) 883-3877

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YVETTE ELOUISE MILLER-MONTHROPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER-MONTHROPE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010