Mills, Michael David (CPSO#: 71677)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Phone: (905) 820-3937
Fax: (905) 820-0111
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

#605 - 7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 4M3
Canada
Phone: (905) 456-3937
Fax: (905) 459-5085
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Lakeridge Health - Bowmanville
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 623-3331
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mills Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mills ( CPSO# 71677 )

Business Address:
605 - 7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 4M3
Phone Number: (905) 456-3937

Business Address:
3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Suite 1
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Phone Number: (905) 820-3937

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID MILLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2002