Milne, Laura Anne (CPSO#: 88747)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: 6135332780
Fax: 6135336654
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heffernan & Milne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Heffernan ( CPSO# 85458 )
Dr. L. Milne ( CPSO# 88747 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E2
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2394

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA ANNE MILNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012