Min, Frank (CPSO#: 80892)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Min Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Min ( CPSO# 80892 )

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
2175 Sheppard Avenue East
Unit 308
Toronto ON  M2J 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 638-5889

Business Address:
5734 Yonge Street
Unit 300
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7
Phone Number: (416) 222-5501

Business Address:
Unit 105
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANK MIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2009