Mintz, Randall Robert (CPSO#: 87067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CGMH
459 Hume St
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W8
Phone: (705) 445-2550
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

OATC Collingwood
Unit 3
275 First St
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 293-1541
Fax: (705) 446-2882
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mintz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mintz ( CPSO# 87067 )
Dr. H. Fraser ( CPSO# 91938 )

Business Address:
3 - 275 First Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1A8
Phone Number: (705) 293-1541

Business Address:
344 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W3
Phone Number: (705) 445-9044

Business Address:
16 - 556 Byrne Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 9P6
Phone Number: (705) 241-8745

Business Address:
CGMH 459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W8
Phone Number: (705) 445-4358

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jul 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANDALL ROBERT MINTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINTZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2009