Mirka, Theresa Mary (CPSO#: 91081)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brady Clinic
359 Riverside Drive Suite 101
Sudbury ON  P3E 1H5
Phone: (705) 688-8833
Fax: (705) 688-8646
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Balmoral Walk in Clinic
1122 Lasalle Blvd
Sudbury, Ontario
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y4
Canada
Phone: 705-566-6917
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Reseau Access Network
400-111 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 4T5
Canada
Phone: (705) 688-0500
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Theresa Mirka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Mirka ( CPSO# 91081 )

Business Address:
111 Elm Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 1T3
Phone Number: (705) 688-0500

Business Address:
1122 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y4
Phone Number: (705) 566-6917

Business Address:
Brady Clinic
359 Riverside Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1H5
Phone Number: (705) 688-8833

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THERESA MARY MIRKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011