Misir, Anil Jainarayan (CPSO#: 81046)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 837-6461
Fax: (519) 837-6462
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Misir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Misir ( CPSO# 84770 )
Dr. A. Misir ( CPSO# 81046 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre VH
Room E4-211
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8134

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANIL JAINARAYAN MISIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009