Mitchell, Ryan William Keith (CPSO#: 92909)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 204
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone: (705) 323-9800
Fax: (705) 323-9601
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aguilar Mitchell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mitchell ( CPSO# 92909 )
Dr. K. Aguilar ( CPSO# 93584 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 323-9800

Business Address:
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN WILLIAM KEITH MITCHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITCHELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2012