Mo, Fan Danie (CPSO#: 90980)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 301
1637 Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 1W2
Phone: (613) 369-5060
Fax: 613-421-4251
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fan Mo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Mo ( CPSO# 90980 )

Business Address:
301 - 1637 Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 1W2
Phone Number: (613) 369-5060

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAN DANIE MO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011