Mocon, Aaron Reuben (CPSO#: 88464)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto, Ontario M2K 1E1
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6520
Fax: (855) 756 3454
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Baycrest Health Sciences
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 2722
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aaron R. Mocon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mocon ( CPSO# 88464 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
Suite 15E-157
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
Baycrest Health Sciences Centre
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON REUBEN MOCON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOCON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013