Mohajer, Pouya (CPSO#: 101263)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saint James School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100-1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 3C2
Canada
Phone: (416) 291-7719
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohajer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mohajer ( CPSO# 101263)

Business Address:
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 3C2
Phone Number: (416) 291-7719

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 21 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. POUYA MOHAJER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAJER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2015