Mohan, Ravi Michael (CPSO#: 85166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
N C S B - 1C - 546
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 3372
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. R.M. Mohan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mohan ( CPSO# 85166 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
N C S B -1C-546
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3111


Corporation Name: H. Schmidt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Schmidt ( CPSO# 77345 )
Dr. D. Mandell ( CPSO# 79347 )
Dr. T. Chung ( CPSO# 74873 )
Dr. M. Lax ( CPSO# 68111 )
Dr. R. Mohan ( CPSO# 85166 )
Dr. R. Farb ( CPSO# 55462 )
Dr. A. Hanbidge ( CPSO# 63102 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
562 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X6
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
1 - PMP 284
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 256, 3rd Floor
256 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Suite 918
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAVI MICHAEL MOHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2012