Mohareb, Mona Milad (CPSO#: 92248)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mona Mohareb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Cornwall Community Hospital 840 McConnell Avenue Cornwall ON K6H 5S5
Date Received: 01 May 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Apr 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 May 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017