Mohindra, Ruchi Nidhi (CPSO#: 82828)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hosptial
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (647) 827-9200
Fax: (647) 827-9202
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queen's Quay Medical
10 Lower Jarvis street
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z2
Canada
Phone: (647) 827-9200
Fax: (647) 827-9202
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Lansdowne Dundas Medical Clinc
222 Lansdowne Ave unit 200
Toronto Ontario
M6K 3C6
Toronto ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
Phone: (647) 725-6555
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ruchi N. Mohindra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mohindra ( CPSO# 82828 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6435

Business Address:
Lansdowne Dundas Medical Clinic
222 Lansdowne Avenue
Suite 200
Toronto ON  M6K 3C6
Phone Number: (647) 725-6555

Business Address:
Queen's Quay Medical
10 Lower Jarvis Street
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z2
Phone Number: (647) 827-9200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUCHI NIDHI MOHINDRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHINDRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2008