Moitri, Misha Othir (CPSO#: 97825)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2018

Expiry Date:  26 Sep 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Sep 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
525 Colborne St
Brantford ON  N3S 3P3
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

422 Grey St
Brantford ON  N3S 4X8
Canada
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Southmount Healthcare Centre
35 Upper Centennial Pkwy
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 27 Sep 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 26 Sep 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Misha  Othir  Moitri  may  practise  otolaryngology  - head and neck
                  surgery,  while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor  acceptable
                  to the College, at the following locations:

                  (i)   525 Colborne Street in Brantford, Ontario;
                  
                  (ii)  Brantford General Hospital in Brantford, Ontario;
                  
                  (iii) 2591 Walkers Line in Burlington, Ontario;
                  
                  (iv)  422 Grey Street in Brantford, Ontario; and
                  
                  (v)   Southmount Healthcare Centre in Stoney Creek, Ontario. 
                  
            2.    The certificate  of  registration  automatically expires three years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Moitri's  eligibility  to take the Royal
                  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Canada  examination  expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Moitri's  knowledge,  skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to  the  College  by  the  due  date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Moitri's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 27, 2018, and will  expire  on or
                  before September 26, 2021, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.