Moltyaner, Yuri (CPSO#: 68993)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: 9054942120
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yuri Moltyaner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Moltyaner ( CPSO# 68993 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 27 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YURI MOLTYANER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLTYANER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1999