Momin, Rizwanali (CPSO#: 86388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 8831212
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON  N9A1E1
Canada
Phone: 519 9734411
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Canada
Phone: (807) 468-9861
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3H5
Canada
Phone: (705) 337 4090
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2
Canada
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

421 Shepherdson
New Liskeard ON  P0J1P0
Canada
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Momin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Momin ( CPSO# 86388 )

Business Address:
Temiskaming Hospital
421 Shepherd Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 848-7181

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary Health
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
Lake of Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Business Address:
Sensenbrenner Hospital
101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3H5
Phone Number: (705) 337-6111

Business Address:
St. Joseph's General Hospital
70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2
Phone Number: (705) 848-7181

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Oullette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RIZWANALI MOMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOMIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009