Moncrief, Karli Jean (CPSO#: 93311)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
328 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P7
Phone: (905) 771-8821
Fax: (905) 771-8481
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3030 Lawrence Avenue E, Suite 510
Toronto ON  M1P 2T7
Canada
Phone: 416-431-4402
Fax: 416-431-0762
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

817 Brown's Line
Toronto ON  M8W 3W2
Canada
Phone: 416-503-2626
Fax: 416-503-2665
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

700 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: 416-551-6006
Fax: 416-551-6009
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

187 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON  M4V 1P7
Canada
Phone: 416-922-6022
Fax: 416-927-9100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karli Moncrief Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Moncrief ( CPSO# 93311 )

Business Address:
187 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4V 1P7

Business Address:
790 Bay Street
Suite 700
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8

Business Address:
328 Highway 7 East
Suite 301
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P7
Phone Number: (905) 771-8821

Business Address:
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 510
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 431-4402

Business Address:
817 Brown's Line
Toronto ON  M8W 3W2
Phone Number: (416) 354-2000

Business Address:
303-2227 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Phone Number: (905) 569-7007

Business Address:
206-688 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3B7
Phone Number: (416) 463-7007

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 08 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARLI JEAN MONCRIEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONCRIEF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 29 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2014