Moore, Julie Bennett (CPSO#: 78525)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Indiana University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alexandra Marine & General Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone: (519) 524-8323
Fax: (519) 524-8257
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

South Bruce Grey Health Centre
43 Queen Street
P O Box 4000
Kincardine ON  N2Z 2Z2
Canada
Phone: (519) 396-3331
Fax: (519) 396-5136
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Moore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Moore ( CPSO# 78525 )

Business Address:
Obstetrics & Gynaecology Department
Alexandra Marine & General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone Number: (519) 524-8323

Business Address:
Clinton Public Hospital
98 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 482-3440

Business Address:
South Bruce Grey Health Centre
43 Queen Street
PO Box 4000
Kincardine ON  N2Z 2Z2
Phone Number: (519) 396-3331

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE BENNETT MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Sep 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Jul 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007