Morand, Allison Renee (CPSO#: 82958)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
20 Emma Street
Chatham ON  N7L 5K5
Phone: (519) 354-2172
Fax: (866) 539-6714
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allison Morand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Morand ( CPSO# 82958 )

Business Address:
Suite 109
20 Emma Street
Chatham ON  N7L 5K5
Phone Number: (519) 354-2172

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLISON RENEE MORAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007