Moreno Garijo, Jacobo (CPSO#: 89623)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 2015

Expiry Date:  31 Jan 2022

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Feb 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Valencia, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia and
Pain Management
200 Elizabeth Street, EN3-460
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3227
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moreno Garijo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Moreno Garijo ( CPSO# 89623 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia and Pain Management
200 Elizabeth Street
EN3-460
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3227

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Feb 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 31 Jan 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Sep 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Jacobo Moreno Garijo may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Anaesthesia, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Moreno Garijo
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Moreno Garijo  no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Moreno Garijo's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Moreno Garijo's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on February 1, 2015.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on January 31, 2022.