Morgan, Danielle Lindsay (CPSO#: 94560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: Farrow, Danielle Lindsay (used until: 28 Feb 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 250
123 3rd Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 1C6
Phone: (705) 264-1313
Fax: (705) 268-7444
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Danielle Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Morgan ( CPSO# 94560 )

Business Address:
640 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Business Address:
Suite 250
123 Third Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 1C6
Phone Number: (705) 264-1313

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jan 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELLE LINDSAY MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 25 Oct 2010 to 16 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 17 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Sep 2013 to 14 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2014