Morgan, Magid Habib Abdou (CPSO#: 82073)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2242
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Anaesthesia Associates
439 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N4
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-7361
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

St Mary General Hospital
Department Of Anesthesia
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-6485
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary El-Brakey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Morgan ( CPSO# 82073 )
Dr. M. El-Brakey ( CPSO# 80380 )

Business Address:
Anesthesia Associates
439 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N4
Phone Number: (519) 744-7361

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
St. Mary's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311


Corporation Name: Magid Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Morgan ( CPSO# 82073 )
Dr. M. El-Brakey ( CPSO# 80380 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
835 King Street West
PO Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
St. Mary General Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6485

Business Address:
Anesthesia Associates
439 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N4
Phone Number: (519) 744-7361

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 29 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAGID HABIB ABDOU MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 25 Feb 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 26 Feb 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History