Mosli, Mahmoud Hisham Ahmed (CPSO#: 86099)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahmoud Mosli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 28 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2007 to 04 Jul 2007
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 13 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 2009 to 13 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2016