Mossdorf, Philipp (CPSO#: 77044)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:George August Univ of Gottingen, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C H E O
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2431
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nakajima Mossdorf Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nakajima ( CPSO# 81935 )
Dr. P. Mossdorf ( CPSO# 77044 )

Business Address:
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 241-3344

Business Address:
Wabano Aboriginal Health Centre
299 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1L 6B8
Phone Number: (613) 748-5999

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital (General Campus)
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIPP MOSSDORF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOSSDORF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2004