Mousa, Anushi Tharanga (CPSO#: 83093)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Sinhalese

Education:Patrice Lumumba People's Friendship Univ, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8/149 West Burleigh Rd
Burleigh Waters 4220
Australia
Phone: +61 755935561
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

395 Southdale Rd East
London ON  N6E 1A2
Canada
Phone: (519) 691-0967
Fax: (519) 691-1172
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

395 Southdale Rd East
London ON  N6E1A2
Canada
Phone: 5196910967
Fax: 5196911172
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anushi Mousa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mousa ( CPSO# 83093 )

Business Address:
395 Southdale Road East
Suite C
London ON  N6E 1A2
Phone Number: (519) 691-0100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANUSHI THARANGA MOUSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007