Muise, Suzanne Lesley (CPSO#: 89882)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Suzanne Muise Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: 189 Elm Street St. Thomas, ON N5R 5C4 Telephone: 519-633-9292 Fax: 519-633-9413
Date Received: 28 Mar 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 21 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2008
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2014