Mulhern, Katie Maureen (CPSO#: 93728)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Supportive Care Clinic
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y2P9
Phone: 9058954521 Ext. 6080
Fax: 9059523050
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Katie Mulhern Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mulhern ( CPSO# 93728 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Palliative And Supportive Care
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATIE MAUREEN MULHERN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULHERN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2012