Mumtaz, Soraya Sofia (CPSO#: 95396)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 111
214 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Phone: (416) 978-8030
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Soraya Mumtaz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mumtaz ( CPSO# 95396 )

Business Address:
111- 214 College street
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Phone Number: (416) 978-8030

Business Address:
692 Euclid Avenue
Toronto ON  M6G 2T9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SORAYA SOFIA MUMTAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUMTAZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2016