Munhoz, Renato Puppi (CPSO#: 78681)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Aug 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal Do Parana, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurology
McLaughlin Pavilion, 7th Floor
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 5729
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Renato P. Munhoz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Munhoz ( CPSO# 78681 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
McL 7, Office 7MC 413
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 13 Aug 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Nov 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Apr 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 06 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Renato Puppi Munhoz may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Neurology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Munhoz
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Munhoz no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.