Murphy, David Gerard (CPSO#: 58468)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Emergency Department
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Fax: (519) 667-6769
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Centre
Urgent Care Department
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6000
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Health Force Ontario
7th Floor
285 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W1
Canada
Phone: (416) 598-5960
Fax: (416) 598-5968
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1-90 7th ave
Hanover
Hanover ON  N4N 1N1
Canada
Phone: (519) 364-2340 Ext. 0
Fax: (519) 364-6602
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03

98 Shipley St
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Canada
Phone: (519) 482-3447
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Murphy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Murphy ( CPSO# 58468 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Urgent Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Emergency Department
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6538

Business Address:
Health Force Ontario
Emergency Department, Coverage Project
Suite 700
285 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W1
Phone Number: (416) 598-5960

Business Address:
98 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 482-3440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID GERARD MURPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURPHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1989