Murray, Catherine Louise (CPSO#: 76241)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Paediatrics
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2677
Fax: (613) 738-4286
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Farhad Motamedi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Murray ( CPSO# 76241 )
Dr. F. Motamedi ( CPSO# 76295 )

Business Address:
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4334

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE LOUISE MURRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURRAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005