Mwamwenda-Heinrich, Escort (CPSO#: 93797)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sioux Lookout First Nations Health
Primary Health Care Unit
61 Queen Street
PO Box 1300
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B8
Phone: (807) 737-1802
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Mwamwenda-Heinrich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Mwamwenda-Heinrich ( CPSO# 93797 )

Business Address:
Sioux Lookout First Nations Health Authority
Primary Health Care Unit
61 Queen Street PO Box 1300
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B8
Phone Number: (807) 737-1802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
South Huron Hospital Exeter
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jan 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ESCORT MWAMWENDA-HEINRICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MWAMWENDA-HEINRICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2016 to 01 Apr 2016
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2014