Myrehaug, Sten Donald (CPSO#: 82867)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4834
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sten Myrehaug Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Myrehaug ( CPSO# 82867 )
Dr. J. Nguyen ( CPSO# 82868 )

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4834

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEN DONALD MYREHAUG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYREHAUG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010