Myron, Hilary Stephanie (CPSO#: 90982)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Ottawa ON  K1J 8L1
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4315
Fax: (613) 907-8027
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Division of Respirology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: (613) 738-4865
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HILARY STEPHANIE MYRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYRON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 17 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 18 Jan 2011 to 17 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 18 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2014 to 31 May 2015
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014