Rosta, Neil Iain Nandor (CPSO#: 67897)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
P O Box 1800
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Fax: (519) 372-3954
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Owen Sound Medical Imaging
1415 1st Ave. W.
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Canada
Phone: (519) 376-2000
Fax: (519) 376-6753
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neil Rosta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rosta ( CPSO# 67897 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121


Corporation Name: Dr.'s Thomson, Howlett, Hawkes, Rosta, Saab, Baldauf, Greaves & McIver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Drover ( CPSO# 82776 )
Dr. S. Thomson ( CPSO# 57552 )
Dr. N. Rosta ( CPSO# 67897 )
Dr. G. Saab ( CPSO# 81104 )
Dr. C. McIver ( CPSO# 31778 )
Dr. L. Howlett ( CPSO# 68288 )
Dr. R. Hawkes ( CPSO# 77933 )
Dr. F. Greaves ( CPSO# 31954 )
Dr. C. Baldauf ( CPSO# 72518 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
Owen Sound Medical Centre
Suite 3600
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 376-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL IAIN NANDOR ROSTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1996