Nadarajah, Sumathi (CPSO#: 61077)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 110
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 569-8100
Fax: (905) 607-3384
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1440 Bathurst street
Toronto ON  M5R3J3
Canada
Phone: 4166545437
Fax: 6476892371
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Nadarajah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nadarajah ( CPSO# 61077 )

Business Address:
110 - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 569-8100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUMATHI NADARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADARAJAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1990