Nag, Sanjita (CPSO#: 76153)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Mar 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Nov 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100-110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone: 905-472-8911
Fax: 905-472-6081
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sanjita Nag Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nag ( CPSO# 76153 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 472-8911

Business Address:
Suite 3
60 Town Centre Court
Scarborough ON  M1P 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 792-2656

Business Address:
Suite 100
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-7759

Medical Records Location

Address: Urgent Care 1615 Dundas Street East Whitby, ON L1N 2L1 Tel: 905 436 3240
Instructions: For medical record inquiries please contact Dr. Mark Waxman.
Date Received: 02 Nov 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Feb 2004 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 13 Nov 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 13 Nov 2014 Active View Details [+]


            As from November 13, 2014, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sanjita Nag, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Nag to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Nag has voluntarily relinquished her prescribing privileges with
                  respect to the following drugs, substances and preparations set out in
                  the corresponding regulations, as amended from time to time, and
                  summarized as follows:
                              
                  
            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    Relinquished

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    Relinquished

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                 Relinquished

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)        Relinquished

            All Other Monitored Drugs                                    
            (as defined under the Narcotic 
            Safety and Awareness Act, S.O. 
            2010, c. 22)                               Relinquished