Nagar, Rohit (CPSO#: 87988)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Mahatma Gandhi Memorial Medical College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nixon Medical Centre
510 Southdale Road East
Suite 301
London ON  N6E 0B2
Phone: 519-690-2806 Ext. 2
Fax: 519-672-7888
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Children's After Hours Clinic
101 Fanshawe Park Rd E
London ON  N5X 3V9
Canada
Phone: 519-850-3800
Fax: 519-850-5099
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

London Health Sciences Center
Department of Pediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 58129
Fax: 519-685-8156
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rohit Nagar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nagar ( CPSO# 87988 )

Business Address:
Nixon Medical Centre
Suite 301
510 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6E 0B2
Phone Number: (519) 690-2806

Business Address:
Children's After Hour Clinic
101 Fanshawe Park Road East
London ON  N5X 3V9
Phone Number: (519) 850-3800

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Pediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROHIT NAGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2008 to 24 Feb 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Feb 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2010 to 13 Jan 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Oct 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2016