Nahirny, Taras (CPSO#: 94514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trafalgar Professional Centre
Suite 300
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone: (905) 842-0071
Fax: (905) 844-3811
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Taras Nahirny Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Nahirny ( CPSO# 94514 )

Business Address:
Trafalgar Professional Centre
Suite 300
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 842-0071

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARAS NAHIRNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAHIRNY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2010 to 17 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Jan 2011 to 25 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2011 to 25 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2012