Nair, Sabarinath Balachandran (CPSO#: 96413)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Mar 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
711 Concession St
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 42247
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Nair Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nair ( CPSO# 96575 )
Dr. S. Nair ( CPSO# 96413 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
HSC - 2V14
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4L8

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jul 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 14 Mar 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 17 Aug 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 18 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Sabarinath Balachandran Nair may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Radiology, McMaster University, in which Dr. Nair holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires when Dr. Nair no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.