Narayan, Abhishek (CPSO#: 95321)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Sciences,Debrecen, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 8320
Fax: 226-646-7846
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

20 Field Gate St
Kitchener ON  N2M 5K3
Canada
Phone: (519) 741-0221
Fax: 226-646-7846
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4300
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abhishek Narayan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Narayan ( CPSO# 95321 )

Business Address:
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
20 Fieldgate Street
Kitchener ON  N2M 5K3
Phone Number: (519) 741-0221

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABHISHEK NARAYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARAYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2014