Narayanan, Gopalakrishnan (CPSO#: 72870)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Mar 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue Room S-107
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6432
Fax: (416) 813-6414
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Holland Bloorview Kids Rehab Hospit
150 Kilgour Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Grandview Children's Centre
600 Townline Road South
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

ErinoakKids
10145 McVean Drive
Brampton ON  L6P 4K7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Narayanan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Narayanan ( CPSO# 72870 )

Business Address:
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue Room S-107
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6432

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 07 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GOPALAKRISHNAN NARAYANAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARAYANAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Nov 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 25 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2005