Narine, Andy Joey (CPSO#: 84150)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone: (905) 309-2220
Fax: (905) 309-2210
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andy Joey Narine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 2 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 25 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDY JOEY NARINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARINE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 17 Apr 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011