Narsinghani, Leena (CPSO#: 90494)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dr. N.T.R University of Health Sciences, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 43203
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leena Narsinghani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Narsinghani ( CPSO# 90494 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEENA NARSINGHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARSINGHANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2013