Nassim, Mark Adel (CPSO#: 83091)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greenboro Family Medicine Centre
25 Tapiola Crescent
Second Floor
Ottawa ON  K1T 2J7
Phone: (613) 738-0303
Fax: (613) 738-8950
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.A. Nassim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nassim ( CPSO# 83091 )

Business Address:
Greenboro Family Medicine Centre
25 Tapiola Crescent
2nd Floor
Ottawa ON  K1T 2J7
Phone Number: (613) 738-0303

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8

Business Address:
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8

Business Address:
Primrose Family Medicine Centre
35 Primrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1R 0A1
Phone Number: (613) 230-7775

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ADEL NASSIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASSIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007