Natt, Diljaan Singh (CPSO#: 108065)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Appletree Medical Group
1595 Merivale Rd
Ottawa ON  K2G 3J4
Phone: (613) 482-011
Fax: 613-688-0315
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Natt ( CPSO# 108065)

Business Address:
1883 Bank Street West
Ottawa ON  K1V 7Z9
Phone Number: (613) 526-2850

Business Address:
1595 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K2G 3K2
Phone Number: (613) 482-0116

Business Address:
310 Titan Private
Ottawa ON  K2G 0B1
Phone Number: (613) 656-1450

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Oct 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DILJAAN SINGH NATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NATT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Feb 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2018